LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1134
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1134
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session
Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1134
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 8, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 28, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 2, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 6, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 10, 2022
Compare