Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022