Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2022

Amended

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022