Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022