House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Standridge |