House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Bullard |