Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1252 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022