Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Daniels, Pugh, Quinn, Simpson, Dossett (J.J.), Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 21
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|