Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB126 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2021