Senate | 04/25/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Simpson |