Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022