Senate | 04/26/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hicks | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rader |