Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB128 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 18, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2021