Senate | 04/25/2022 | Vetoed 04/25/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Haste |