Senate | 04/26/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Motion expired | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Lepak | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 30 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | Remove Representative Gann as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lepak | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Daniels |