Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/27/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
SCs named McCortney, Treat, Thompson, Garvin, Rosino, Hicks, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Pae, McDugle, Roe, Moore, Talley, Cornwell, Marti, Fetgatter, Culver, Lawson, Humphrey, Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton, Bush
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|