Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB131 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021