Senate | 05/03/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Remove Representative Caldwell (Chad) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Garvin | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Remove as author Senator Garvin; authored by Senator Pugh | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin |