Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022