Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022