Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCs named McCortney, Rosino, Haste, Garvin, Montgomery, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Randleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Withdrawn from Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|