Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|