Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1339 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022