Senate | 05/20/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Garvin |