Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1344 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2022