Senate | 04/25/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2022 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Hall |