Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 4, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022