Senate | 05/05/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/05/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | Withdrawn from General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Floyd |