Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022