Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SCs named Standridge, Bergstrom, Allen, Burns, David, Matthews, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|