Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2022
Bill February 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 7, 2022