Senate | 04/12/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/12/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Jech | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Brooks |