Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 7, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021