Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 25, 2022