Senate | 05/20/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |