Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2022