Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1414 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022