House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Dahm |