Senate | 05/20/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/16/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Manger (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Stanley |