House | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Rogers | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Daniels |