House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|