Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1481 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 22, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022