Senate | 04/21/2022 | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Paxton |