Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022