Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB149 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2021