Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/25/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
SCs named Treat, Thompson, Hall, McCortney, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Special Conference Committee on ARPA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|