Senate | 05/02/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Weaver |