Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022