House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Newhouse |