Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
SCs named Pugh, Pemberton, Stanley, Taylor, Newhouse, Dossett (J.A.), Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|